U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. High Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Release from Custody]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 21, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 27, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 27, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 19, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 13, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 15, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 15, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 01, 2021: [Delivered]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 21, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 21, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • May 20, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 28, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 28, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 16, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 10, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 01, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 01, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 01, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 01, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 01, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 28, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • September 25, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 16, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 03, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 13, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 13, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 13, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 27, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 27, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 27, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • August 27, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 27, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 27, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 27, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 27, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 27, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 27, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • September 06, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Earned Pro-Social Time Off of Supervision]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.