U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-30017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dupris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 27, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 27, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 11, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 11, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 11, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 11, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 09, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 05, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 16, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 16, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 16, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 16, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 16, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 10, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.