U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dupris et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 23, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 02, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 02, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 25, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 27, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 11, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 11, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 11, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 06, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 11, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 05, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 16, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 16, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 16, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 16, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 10, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 10, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.