U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. His Law
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 11, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 09, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 09, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 15, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 01, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 01, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 30, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 23, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 31, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 31, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • March 31, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 31, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 31, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • March 30, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • March 30, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.