U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-50075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tobacco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Consent]
  • January 29, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 08, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 08, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 08, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Text Order]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 12, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 17, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 30, 2018: [Furlough]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 26, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 26, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • May 26, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 25, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.