U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kills Crow Indian
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 20, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 07, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 21, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2022: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 16, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 01, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2022: [Consent]
  • August 15, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 08, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • May 03, 2022: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 13, 2022: [Furlough]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 28, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 28, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 15, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Appeal Record Returned]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 28, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Transcript - Redacted]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • January 03, 2018: [Transcript Redaction Request]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • December 12, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 12, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 12, 2017: [Transcript]
  • December 12, 2017: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • December 01, 2017: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 13, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 13, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 26, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 19, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 15, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 15, 2017: [Extend]
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • June 01, 2017: [Verdict]
  • June 01, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • June 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 01, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 01, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 31, 2017: [Jury List]
  • May 31, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • May 30, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 26, 2017: [In Limine]
  • May 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 19, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 19, 2017: [In Limine]
  • May 17, 2017: [Supplement]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 12, 2017: [Notice]
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.