U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10044
  • Case Name: Dianne Leatha Howell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • May 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.