U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40136
  • Case Name: Todd Allen Gilger and Tatiana Rose Gilger
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
April, 2018
  • April 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
July, 2017
  • July 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • June 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • April 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • April 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Corrective Entry]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.