U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04050
  • Case Name: Dobney v. Klunder et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Response]
  • April 11, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order]
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 15, 2017: [Received]
  • September 15, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 15, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • September 15, 2017: [Brief]
  • September 15, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • May 16, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 03, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 14, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 13, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • April 13, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 13, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 13, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 13, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.