U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30004-6
  • Case Name: USA v. Waln et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • May 01, 2019: [Receipt]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • March 04, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 04, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • May 29, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 29, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 29, 2018: [Transcript]
  • May 25, 2018: [Transcript]
  • May 25, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 23, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 30, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 19, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 18, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 30, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • March 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 27, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order]
  • March 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 23, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 23, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
  • March 21, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 21, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 20, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 20, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 20, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 19, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • March 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • March 15, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
  • March 15, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 13, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • March 09, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
  • March 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 07, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 07, 2018: [Extend]
  • March 06, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 05, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 01, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 28, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 20, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 13, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 26, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 24, 2018: [Response]
  • January 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 18, 2018: [Acquittal]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2018: [Response]
  • January 08, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 08, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • January 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • January 05, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • January 05, 2018: [Verdict]
  • January 05, 2018: [Response to Jury Question]
  • January 05, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 05, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 05, 2018: [Witness List]
  • January 05, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 04, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • January 04, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • January 03, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 03, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 02, 2018: [Jury List]
  • January 02, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 02, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 02, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 02, 2018: [Brief]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 02, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 02, 2018: [Witness List]
  • January 01, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 01, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • January 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • December 29, 2017: [Witness List]
  • December 29, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 29, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 29, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 29, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • December 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 28, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 28, 2017: [Brief]
  • December 28, 2017: [Notice]
  • December 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • December 27, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 27, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 27, 2017: [Notice]
  • December 27, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 27, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 26, 2017: [In Limine]
  • December 26, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 26, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 26, 2017: [Seal Existing Document]
  • December 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 22, 2017: [Brief]
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice]
  • December 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 19, 2017: [Sever Defendant]
  • December 19, 2017: [Request]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice]
  • December 19, 2017: [Jury List]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • December 13, 2017: [Certificate]
  • December 13, 2017: [Response]
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 12, 2017: [Response]
  • December 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 05, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 05, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 28, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 27, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 24, 2017: [Response]
  • November 16, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 13, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2017: [Jury List]
  • November 09, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 08, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 02, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 01, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Furlough]
  • October 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 31, 2017: [Request]
  • October 31, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 30, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 23, 2017: [Transcript]
  • October 19, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 19, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 16, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 16, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 10, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2017: [Continue]
  • October 05, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • September 21, 2017: [Disclosure ]
  • September 19, 2017: [Disclosure ]
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 12, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 08, 2017: [Supplement]
  • September 08, 2017: [Furlough]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 05, 2017: [Furlough]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 25, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 25, 2017: [Furlough]
  • August 23, 2017: [Furlough]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 16, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 16, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 14, 2017: [Extend]
  • August 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 10, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 07, 2017: [Furlough]
  • August 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 03, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • August 01, 2017: [Consent]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 27, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 27, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order]
  • July 17, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 14, 2017: [Suppress]
  • July 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 12, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 12, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 12, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 10, 2017: [Furlough]
  • July 07, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 22, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 02, 2017: [Consent]
  • June 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Consent]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 26, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 26, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 26, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 16, 2017: [Joinder]
  • May 16, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 16, 2017: [Suppress]
  • May 16, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order]
  • May 12, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2017: [Request]
  • April 20, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 17, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • April 13, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 13, 2017: [Arrest]
  • April 13, 2017: [Request]
  • April 13, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 13, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 13, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.