U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sosa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 26, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 26, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 24, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 18, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 18, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 28, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 21, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 21, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 21, 2017: [Waiver]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 03, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 03, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 19, 2017: [Request]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 12, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 12, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 12, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 12, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 12, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 12, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 12, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 10, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2017: [Sealed Order]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 18, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • April 18, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.