U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-04009
  • Case Name: Pierce v. Stanford
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Receipt of Filing Fee]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
  • June 21, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 21, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Certified Copy]
  • June 08, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 08, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Default Judgment]
  • June 05, 2018: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Default Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 18, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 16, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Order]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 23, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 23, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 23, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Entry of Default]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Service Executed]
  • April 20, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summons Issued]
  • April 20, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Fees - Deferred]
  • April 20, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.