U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04054
  • Case Name: Connell v. South Dakota Soybean Processors, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 18, 2018: [Dismiss]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 22, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 19, 2017: [Discovery Report]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 07, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • May 15, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • April 21, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 21, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 21, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 21, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.