U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Escalante-Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 22, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 13, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 28, 2017: [Waiver]
  • August 28, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 15, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 07, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 07, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 06, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 05, 2017: [Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 23, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 23, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 23, 2017: [Discovery]
  • May 19, 2017: [Response]
  • May 10, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • May 10, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • May 09, 2017: [Request]
  • May 09, 2017: [Response]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Request]
  • April 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 26, 2017: [Arrest]
  • April 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • April 26, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 25, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.