U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-50065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 16, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 16, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 11, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 15, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 15, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 15, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • December 05, 2017: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 06, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 28, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 28, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 26, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 26, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 26, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.