U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:06-cr-50022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Austad
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • April 15, 2019: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 05, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • February 08, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • February 08, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 06, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • May 08, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 08, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 08, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 08, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.