U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-30003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brandis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 20, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 16, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 13, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • April 13, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 01, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 01, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 01, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 01, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • March 18, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 11, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 10, 2020: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 10, 2020: [Request for Warrant]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 04, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 18, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 28, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 24, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 18, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 28, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 08, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 07, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 23, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 26, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.