U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40158
  • Case Name: Becky Agnes Rindels
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Case Reassigned]
May, 2021
  • May 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
March, 2018
  • March 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Evidentiary Hearing]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Transcript (Depositions and 2004 Exams Only)]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice to Take Deposition]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response to Request for Admissions/Production of Documents]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Interrogatory Answers]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Interrogatory Answers]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Production of Documents]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Interrogatories]
November, 2017
  • November 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
September, 2017
  • September 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
April, 2017
  • April 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.