U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ricker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Receipt]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 01, 2021: [USCA Order]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
  • December 22, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 22, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 22, 2020: [Forfeiture]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 10, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 07, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 05, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 05, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 05, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 05, 2019: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • August 02, 2019: [Transcript]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 27, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • June 27, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 25, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 17, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 14, 2019: [Witness List]
  • June 13, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 11, 2019: [Objection]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 07, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 05, 2019: [Furlough]
  • June 04, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 23, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 16, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 14, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • April 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 27, 2019: [Acquittal]
  • March 27, 2019: [New Trial]
  • March 25, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 25, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 25, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • March 25, 2019: [Verdict]
  • March 25, 2019: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • March 25, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 21, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • March 19, 2019: [Supplement]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 19, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • March 19, 2019: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • March 19, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 19, 2019: [Jury List]
  • March 19, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 18, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 18, 2019: [In Limine]
  • March 18, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 17, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 15, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 15, 2019: [In Limine]
  • March 15, 2019: [Objection]
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 13, 2019: [Objection]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 11, 2019: [Response]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 11, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 11, 2019: [Brief]
  • March 11, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 11, 2019: [Objection]
  • March 11, 2019: [In Limine]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 07, 2019: [In Limine]
  • March 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 05, 2019: [Brief]
  • March 05, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 04, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 01, 2019: [Subpoena Issued]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • February 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 25, 2019: [In Limine]
  • February 25, 2019: [Jury List]
  • February 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 08, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 07, 2019: [Brief]
  • February 07, 2019: [In Limine]
  • February 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • February 04, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2019: [Brief]
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice]
  • January 22, 2019: [Status Conference]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2018: [Status Conference]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 10, 2018: [Transcript]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 03, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 28, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 27, 2018: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • September 26, 2018: [Notice]
  • September 26, 2018: [Witness List]
  • September 25, 2018: [Witness List]
  • September 25, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 17, 2018: [Response]
  • September 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 10, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 10, 2018: [Suppress]
  • September 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2018: [Competency Report]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 02, 2018: [Competency Evaluation]
  • July 02, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2018: [Consent]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 23, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 22, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • January 04, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • January 04, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 02, 2017: [Consent]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 16, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 16, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 16, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 31, 2017: [Detainer Lodged]
  • August 30, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 29, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 28, 2017: [Witness List]
  • August 23, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 18, 2017: [Compel ]
  • August 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 10, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 08, 2017: [Document Returned]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • July 11, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • July 11, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • July 05, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • July 03, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • May 02, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 01, 2017: [Request]
  • May 01, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Produce ]
  • April 28, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 28, 2017: [Request]
  • April 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order for Repayment of CJA Fees]
  • April 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • April 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 27, 2017: [Arrest]
  • April 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.