U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50088
  • Case Name: Lori Ann Pettis and Arlo Trent Pettis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Hardship Discharge]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Brief]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hardship Discharge]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of No Objection (Text Entry)]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • July 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • May 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • May 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • May 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
April, 2017
  • April 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • April 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • April 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.