U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 12-10182
  • Case Name: Tyler Scott Marken
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • July 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge (Ch 11/13)]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.