U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10050
  • Case Name: Patrick Alan Roggenbuck and Jessica Jo Roggenbuck
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • July 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • June 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
April, 2019
  • April 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver) (fee required)]
July, 2018
  • July 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • June 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Time]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Time]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
March, 2018
  • March 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Deadlines]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • January 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
December, 2017
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • August 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • June 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • May 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.