U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50090
  • Case Name: Donald Frederick Smith and Janet Joy Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
September, 2022
  • September 03, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline(s)]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • August 18, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver) (fee required)]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
November, 2017
  • November 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Claim]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
July, 2017
  • July 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • May 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • May 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.