U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:05-cr-50050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thundershield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 09, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 28, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 07, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • November 07, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 02, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 02, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.