U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-04010
  • Case Name: Byrne et al v. Windsor Estates
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
June, 2017
  • June 24, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 22, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • June 22, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • June 08, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 08, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • June 08, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • June 06, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • May 04, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • May 04, 2017: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.