U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50096
  • Case Name: Kenneth Frank Dahlberg
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Forbearance of Mortgage]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 05, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Forbearance of Mortgage]
January, 2021
  • January 31, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Forbearance of Mortgage]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Forbearance of Secured Claim]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan]
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • August 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Amendment]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • July 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • May 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • May 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor Repayment Plan]
  • May 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
  • May 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.