U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Block
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response]
  • April 02, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Supplement]
  • July 29, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
  • May 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 07, 2022: [Response]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Extend]
  • February 10, 2022: [Supplement]
  • February 01, 2022: [Extend]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Extend]
  • January 05, 2022: [Extend]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 27, 2021: [Supplement]
  • December 27, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • December 22, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • December 16, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 09, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 20, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 20, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 18, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 04, 2019: [Extend]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 12, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 02, 2018: [Extend]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 13, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 10, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 03, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 25, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 21, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 20, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 03, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 03, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 26, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 08, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.