U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clairmont
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 14, 2022: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 14, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 02, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 24, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 23, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 10, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 27, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 27, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • April 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 11, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 11, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 05, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 29, 2017: [Arrest]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Status Conference]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 12, 2017: [Discovery]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Response]
  • June 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 14, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 13, 2017: [Request]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 12, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 12, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 12, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 12, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 09, 2017: [Bail Report]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 30, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 09, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 09, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.