U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vrana
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 25, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 18, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 26, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 26, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 26, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 03, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 16, 2017: [Discovery]
  • June 15, 2017: [Response]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 30, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 30, 2017: [Request]
  • May 26, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 25, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 22, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 09, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 09, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.