U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carrillo-Pacheco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 25, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 25, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 13, 2017: [Extend]
  • June 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 19, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 09, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.