U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Krier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 01, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2018: [Passport - Return of]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 23, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 23, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 22, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 15, 2018: [Extend]
  • October 15, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 15, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • August 22, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • August 09, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • August 03, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 20, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 20, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 18, 2017: [Discovery]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • May 22, 2017: [Request]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 17, 2017: [Arrest]
  • May 17, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order of Recusal]
  • May 16, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.