U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stefanyuk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 05, 2020: [Reconsideration]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 22, 2020: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Supplement]
  • July 02, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • July 02, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 10, 2020: [USCA Order]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 11, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • November 29, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • November 29, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • November 29, 2018: [Transcript]
  • November 29, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • November 21, 2018: [Transcript]
  • November 06, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 05, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 26, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 16, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 01, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 01, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 24, 2018: [Extend]
  • September 10, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • July 19, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • July 19, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 19, 2018: [Verdict]
  • July 19, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • July 19, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 19, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • July 17, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 17, 2018: [Jury List]
  • July 17, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • July 16, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 16, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 10, 2018: [In Limine]
  • July 10, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 09, 2018: [In Limine]
  • July 09, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 09, 2018: [Trial Brief ]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 19, 2018: [Transcript]
  • June 15, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 14, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • June 14, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 08, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 07, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 06, 2018: [Extend]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 29, 2018: [Suppress]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 17, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 09, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice]
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Notice]
  • April 04, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 26, 2018: [Continue]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 07, 2017: [Request]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 06, 2017: [Arrest]
  • June 01, 2017: [Bail Report]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.