U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quenzer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 14, 2020: [Extend]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 02, 2020: [Extend]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • September 01, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 13, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 12, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 12, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 12, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 30, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 30, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 30, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 23, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 21, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 16, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 16, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 15, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 07, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 13, 2017: [Discovery]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2017: [Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 26, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 25, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • May 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 19, 2017: [Response]
  • May 18, 2017: [Request]
  • May 17, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 16, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.