U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aroche-Escobar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 10, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 07, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 07, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 06, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 03, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 13, 2017: [Discovery]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Response]
  • May 17, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [Request]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 11, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 11, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 11, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 11, 2017: [Arrest]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 10, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.