U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lamm
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 02, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 26, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 13, 2020: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • February 11, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 11, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • February 11, 2020: [Transcript]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 31, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 24, 2020: [Supplement]
  • January 21, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 16, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 15, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 06, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 09, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Seal Existing Document]
  • October 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • October 30, 2019: [Verdict]
  • October 30, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • October 30, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 30, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • October 29, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 29, 2019: [Jury List]
  • October 29, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 28, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2019: [Competency Hearing]
  • August 16, 2019: [Psychiatric Report Received]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Competency Report]
  • May 17, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • May 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2019: [Competency Evaluation]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
  • May 01, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 01, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 30, 2019: [Objection]
  • April 30, 2019: [Jury List]
  • April 30, 2019: [In Limine]
  • April 25, 2019: [Objection]
  • April 16, 2019: [In Limine]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 18, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 16, 2019: [Transcript]
  • January 09, 2019: [Ex Parte CJA Motion]
  • January 04, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2018: [Request]
  • December 21, 2018: [Letter]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Transcript]
  • November 02, 2018: [Letter]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Letter]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 26, 2018: [Letter]
  • September 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2018: [Hearing]
  • September 06, 2018: [Letter]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • August 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • August 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order]
  • August 08, 2018: [Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • July 25, 2018: [Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte CJA Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [Notice]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Notice]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 04, 2018: [Status Conference]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [Letter]
  • March 19, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 20, 2018: [Transcript]
  • February 05, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 05, 2018: [Discovery]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • January 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 09, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte CJA Motion]
  • December 06, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Text Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Letter]
  • November 08, 2017: [Letter]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 30, 2017: [Discovery]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2017: [1 - Ex Parte Docket Entry AND Document]
  • October 17, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • October 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2017: [Request]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • October 03, 2017: [Hearing ]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 29, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 27, 2017: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • September 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 29, 2017: [Discovery]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 21, 2017: [Discovery]
  • August 02, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 01, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 01, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 01, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.