U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jorgenson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 25, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 25, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 02, 2019: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 02, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 02, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
  • August 02, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 23, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 11, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • May 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • April 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 23, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 23, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 11, 2017: [Discovery]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Request]
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 20, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 19, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 19, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 09, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 09, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.