U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chic-Saban
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • July 07, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 07, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 07, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 06, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • June 06, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 02, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 16, 2017: [Discovery]
  • May 10, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 10, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.