U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jewett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 23, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 14, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice]
  • October 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Response to Jury Question]
  • October 10, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • October 10, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • October 10, 2017: [Verdict]
  • October 10, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 10, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 10, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 10, 2017: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • October 06, 2017: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • October 06, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 06, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 03, 2017: [Jury List]
  • October 03, 2017: [Voir Dire Began]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 02, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 29, 2017: [Witness List]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 28, 2017: [Witness List]
  • September 28, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 26, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 25, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 25, 2017: [Subpoena Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 25, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 25, 2017: [Subpoena Issued]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • September 20, 2017: [Subpoena(s)]
  • September 19, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 19, 2017: [Reply]
  • September 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 19, 2017: [Disclosure ]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • September 01, 2017: [Jury List]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 26, 2017: [Request]
  • July 26, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 26, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 24, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 21, 2017: [Witness List]
  • July 20, 2017: [Witness List]
  • July 20, 2017: [Brief]
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice]
  • July 20, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • July 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 19, 2017: [In Limine]
  • July 17, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 17, 2017: [In Limine]
  • July 13, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order]
  • May 25, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 23, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 23, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 23, 2017: [Arrest]
  • May 23, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 23, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 23, 2017: [Request]
  • May 22, 2017: [Request]
  • May 22, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • May 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 16, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.