U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05040
  • Case Name: Hobbs v. Employers Mutual Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2019: [Dismiss]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 31, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 24, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 14, 2018: [Reply]
  • December 04, 2018: [Transcript]
  • December 04, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice]
  • November 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 13, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 13, 2018: [Compel]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • August 22, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 15, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 15, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • August 02, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 24, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • July 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 16, 2018: [Notice]
  • July 16, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 16, 2018: [Stay]
  • July 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 16, 2018: [Quash]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 24, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 24, 2018: [Proposed Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 25, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 25, 2017: [Protective Order]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Form 52 Report]
  • August 10, 2017: [Reply]
  • August 02, 2017: [Response to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 20, 2017: [Strike]
  • July 11, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • June 29, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 07, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • May 16, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 16, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • May 16, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.