U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05042
  • Case Name: Telford v. Bradeen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [USCA Order]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Supplement]
  • July 08, 2019: [Declaration]
  • July 01, 2019: [Declaration]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 24, 2019: [Supplement]
  • June 24, 2019: [Declaration]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order]
  • May 24, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 22, 2019: [Letter Received]
  • May 13, 2019: [Transcript]
  • May 10, 2019: [Letter Received]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 25, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2019: [Text Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Letter Received]
  • March 20, 2019: [Letter Received]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [USCA Order]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 07, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 26, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 21, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 14, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 06, 2018: [Declaration]
  • November 06, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • November 06, 2018: [Notice]
  • November 02, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • November 02, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • November 02, 2018: [Declaration]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 05, 2018: [Extend]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 21, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 08, 2018: [Reply]
  • August 01, 2018: [Declaration]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Declaration]
  • July 30, 2018: [Supplement]
  • July 26, 2018: [Declaration]
  • July 25, 2018: [Letter Received]
  • July 25, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 25, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 10, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 10, 2018: [Strike]
  • July 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 29, 2018: [Strike]
  • June 29, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • June 28, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 26, 2018: [Dismiss Party]
  • June 26, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 22, 2018: [Declaration]
  • June 12, 2018: [Declaration]
  • June 12, 2018: [Return of Service]
  • June 08, 2018: [Reply]
  • June 04, 2018: [Declaration]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Extend]
  • May 15, 2018: [Joinder]
  • May 11, 2018: [Notice]
  • May 10, 2018: [Response]
  • May 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • May 04, 2018: [Response]
  • May 04, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 04, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Declaration]
  • April 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2018: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 20, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 16, 2018: [Reply]
  • April 13, 2018: [Joinder]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 05, 2018: [Declaration]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Stay]
  • March 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 28, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 28, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2018: [Dismiss Party]
  • March 23, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 21, 2018: [Alter Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • February 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 13, 2018: [Joinder]
  • February 12, 2018: [Joinder]
  • February 08, 2018: [Objection]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Reply]
  • November 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Extend]
  • October 03, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Order]
  • September 07, 2017: [Reply]
  • September 06, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 30, 2017: [Response]
  • August 29, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 25, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 25, 2017: [Extend]
  • August 14, 2017: [Extend]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Extend]
  • July 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 26, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • July 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 10, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • July 10, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2017: [Remark]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 13, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • June 06, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 30, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • May 17, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • May 16, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • May 16, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 16, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.