U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dressen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Response]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 10, 2022: [Reconsideration]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 03, 2021: [Response]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • January 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • October 13, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • October 06, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • October 05, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 13, 2020: [Response]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 29, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 26, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 18, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 18, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 18, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 10, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 09, 2020: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 10, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 02, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 02, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 16, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 16, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 08, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 08, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 08, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 22, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 22, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 22, 2018: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • February 20, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 20, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 19, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 05, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 19, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • December 19, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 19, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 19, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 29, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 22, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • August 17, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 11, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 10, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 02, 2017: [Discovery]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 31, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 13, 2017: [Discovery]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 30, 2017: [Discovery]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2017: [Response]
  • June 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 14, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 13, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • June 12, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 12, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 12, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 12, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 12, 2017: [Request]
  • June 01, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 31, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 22, 2017: [Response]
  • May 22, 2017: [Request]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 17, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 16, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.