U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guggolz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • December 13, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 13, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 13, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 28, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 20, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 10, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 05, 2017: [Request]
  • June 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 01, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 31, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 30, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 30, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.