U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grey Bull
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 14, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • August 15, 2018: [Transcript]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Sentencing]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 18, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 07, 2017: [Request]
  • September 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 29, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 29, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • August 29, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 28, 2017: [Request]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.