U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bartlett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 01, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 27, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 26, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 26, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 26, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 02, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 26, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 26, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial]
  • May 19, 2021: [Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 12, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • May 07, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • May 06, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 06, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 06, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 06, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 06, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 21, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 08, 2017: [Extend]
  • December 08, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 04, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 03, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 18, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 23, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 20, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 08, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order]
  • June 07, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 05, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 02, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 02, 2017: [Arrest]
  • June 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 02, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 02, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 02, 2017: [Request]
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 02, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.