U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flute
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2025: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • April 03, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 12, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 05, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 10, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 09, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 09, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 10, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 30, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 30, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 28, 2020: [Extend]
  • July 16, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 24, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 24, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 24, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 24, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 20, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 11, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 10, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 05, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 10, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 20, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 31, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 28, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 25, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 22, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 08, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 08, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 31, 2017: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 31, 2017: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 31, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 31, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 30, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 26, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 25, 2017: [Request]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 25, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 25, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 25, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 24, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 24, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 24, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 24, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 17, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.