U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marshall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 18, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 18, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • December 20, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 15, 2017: [Furlough]
  • December 08, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 16, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • August 11, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 11, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 28, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 09, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 09, 2017: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • June 09, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 09, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 08, 2017: [Request]
  • June 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 08, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 08, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 07, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 25, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order of Recusal]
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.