U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. One Star
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 10, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 30, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 30, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 30, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 19, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 09, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2020: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • January 09, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 09, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 08, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 07, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • January 07, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 25, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 25, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • July 25, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 24, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 29, 2018: [Release from Custody]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 28, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 22, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 22, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 22, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 06, 2017: [Furlough]
  • December 05, 2017: [Furlough]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 29, 2017: [Furlough]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 22, 2017: [Furlough]
  • November 20, 2017: [Furlough]
  • November 06, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • November 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice]
  • November 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 27, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • June 28, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 24, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 24, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 22, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2017: [Arrest]
  • June 22, 2017: [Request]
  • June 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2017: [Request]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.