U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Feather
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 19, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 14, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 06, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 06, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 19, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 13, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 13, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 02, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 26, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 26, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 13, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 22, 2017: [Request]
  • May 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 22, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 22, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 22, 2017: [Arrest]
  • May 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 19, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 19, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 19, 2017: [Request]
  • May 18, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.