U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • January 10, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2019: [Status Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 09, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 14, 2019: [Status Conference]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Status Conference]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Competency Report]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • October 11, 2018: [Competency Report]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • June 08, 2018: [Competency Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 04, 2017: [Competency Evaluation]
  • December 01, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • December 01, 2017: [Sealed Order]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • November 22, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • July 28, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • July 27, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 27, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2017: [Request]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • May 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 18, 2017: [Arrest]
  • May 18, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 18, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 18, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 18, 2017: [Request]
  • May 17, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.