U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Feather
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 27, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 27, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 26, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 26, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 12, 2018: [Furlough]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 31, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • October 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 29, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 08, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 06, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 30, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 22, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 22, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 30, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 30, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • May 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 30, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 30, 2017: [Arrest]
  • May 26, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • May 25, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 22, 2017: [Request]
  • May 17, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 17, 2017: [Indictment]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.